Trustees THE BOOK TRADE CHARITY
Charity number: 1128129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Nowell | Chair | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Meryl Halls | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Chapman | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Richards | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ann Selby Smith | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Brinton | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate McFarlan | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Neale | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Woodward | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Emily-Jane Taylor | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elise Burns | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Veronica Woodhall | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.