Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, COVENTRY
Charity number: 1126698
Charity reporting is up to date (209 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Charles Draper BTech | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Williams CET | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Jackson MD | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amarichi Umah BA | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wilfrid Stephen Kendall | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ambreen Ehsaan B Med | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keri Husband BA AUDIS | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Churchill Gnanaraj B Eng | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Saviour Udeh | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Bishop MA | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Rebecca Hunter BA MA | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Edward Peter Wood MBChB | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nehemiah Aderibigbe Akinyele ACA | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wilcockson CERT. ED. | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew T J Selwyn V M.E. | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Geoffrey Trewinnard BA Hons | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Charles Hibbert | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES HOWARD | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Davies MA OXON | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Geoffery William Wilcox | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRIAN DOGGETT BSC | Trustee | 27 March 2011 |
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES ROY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.