Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SAVIOUR GUILDFORD
Charity number: 1128141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Shaw | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel BIshop | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Daniel Rory Thomas Bishop | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Savage | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bagwell | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Rowlandson | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher How | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Price | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Barnard | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Moore | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Beak | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Stephens | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Pointer | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Morris | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Varley | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Penny Rickman | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lucy Webb | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle Varley | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Pepper | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Snell | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMISON | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.