Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SONNING
Charity number: 1130763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMIE ALEXANDER FRANKLYN TAYLOR | Chair |
|
||||||
Kevin Michael Wilson | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lisa Riley | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Wood | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence Hunt | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Deborah Jeffery | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Heather Justina Hexter | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
INDRA TATJANA BIDDULPH | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
HILARY JANE RENNIE | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rosemary Craig | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Timothy West | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Nelson | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER SAWYER | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SMYLY | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN DARVALL | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANET PETERS | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart David Bowman | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOLLY JEANETTE WOODLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.