Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BOVINGDON
Charity number: 1132570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHARLES EDWARD BURCH | Chair | 03 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
Rev Hilary Kemp | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Mai Cartlidge | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sean Bolton | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Myles Sheppard | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Suzanne Fisher | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Elaine Wright | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alison Clare Woodhams | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Matthew John Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Edwina Louise Tyler | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
KULLY DHADDA | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Flick Crockett | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Gill Barrett | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Gary Cartlidge | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER WEST | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.