Trustees GRANTHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1133324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Megan Sanders | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher John Thoms | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert James McGibbon | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
IAN LINDSAY WHITTLE | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Sally Louise Wooldridge | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Phylis Sanders | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr MALCOLM HEWITSON | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christiana Abimbola Durodola | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Moira Palmer | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Dove | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
AARON THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
David Scott Lynn | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.