Trustees NEWCASTLE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1138091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shah Yaseen Ali | Chair | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kimiko Florence Hoe Ting Cheng | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Leeds | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexantra Kristiana Theodosiou | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lulu Chen | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle de Boer | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chirag Padmesh Kumar | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fridey Cordingley | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Alexander Drewett | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Jeremy Kitchen | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Winship | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Donald Miller | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.