Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAELS, TWERTON, BATH
Charity number: 1147405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard White | Chair | 22 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Qamar Rafiq | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Iain Kyle | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eaton | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Grizzell | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Tatchell | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Hicks | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY PITKIN | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lewis | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Turner | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lewis | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DILYS MARY SMITH | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.