Trustees THE WORCESTER DIOCESAN SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY FUND
Charity number: 504331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE RT REVD JOHN GEOFFREY INGE | Chair | 01 January 2008 |
|
|||||||||||
The Revd Canon Dr Stephen Michael Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Andrew George Todd | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Right Reverend Martin Charles William Gorick | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
THE VEN ROBERT GEORGE JONES | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
THE VEN NICOLA JANE GROARKE | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
ROBERT DESMOND GARVIN | Trustee | 07 March 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
BEVERLEY HIRONS | Trustee | 07 March 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.