Trustees ELY MUSEUM CIO
Charity number: 1156024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Victoria Greaves | Chair | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Hilary Christine Burke | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ellanor Jane Ponton-Hewitt | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Lee Gilpin-Davies | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John David Bull | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Pip Gardner | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Jayne Teresa JAMESON | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Margherita Cesca | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Emma CHILDS | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Ann BIRCH | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr LIS EVERY | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.