Trustees 20TH BRADFORD SOUTH LOW MOOR HOLY TRINITY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 507190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Wheelhouse | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Bleasby | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Hazell | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elton Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Burnley | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Angela Theabould | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Michelle Jones | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CLARE SHEPHERD | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE JACKSON | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.