Trustees YARKHILL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 507436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
martin ennis | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Lawton-Smith | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Sandra Elizabeth Feakins | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Melissa Evelyn Bott | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Aspey | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jean Nash | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DAW | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.