Trustees WHITCHURCH METHODIST CHURCH, CARDIFF
Charity number: 1168635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CATHERINE GALE | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ELAINE POWELL | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Wall Carpenter | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE ANNE IRENE KETTERIDGE | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALISON KETTERIDGE | Trustee | 25 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Allison Patricia Hill | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|||||
MONICA SYMONDS | Trustee | 01 September 2006 |
|
|||||
ANDREW SWATTON | Trustee | 15 June 1998 |
|
|
||||
Christine Stanley | Trustee | 10 April 1995 |
|
|||||
VINCENT CHARLES TAYLOR | Trustee | 13 April 1989 |
|
|
||||
ENID DOROTHY NASH | Trustee | 20 May 1987 |
|
|
||||
DEREK PARFITT BOYCE | Trustee | 28 July 1983 |
|
|
||||
ERIC STANLEY NASH | Trustee | 01 May 1970 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.