Trustees DONCASTER FOODBANK (TRUSSELL TRUST) LTD
Charity number: 1171639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Hymans | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Neil Riley | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Patricia Jordan | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Clish | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev IAN SMITH | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|||||
William Mark Snelson | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.