Trustees MISSION REMISSION
Charity number: 1186956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Branwen Hywel | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mee | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Balwinder Nanray | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Reza | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Robertson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hodge | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Spurgeon | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morgan | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Pickett | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.