Trustees CARTMEL FELL COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 521066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN KATHERINE TODD | Chair | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Longden | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Elliott | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Littlewood | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hodgson | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Martin | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Balshaw | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Sarah Viney | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUTH ELIZABETH SMITH | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.