Trustees ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 1206171
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Andrew Tremlett | Chair | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Paula Gooder | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Peter Michael Aiers OBE | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
MCCULLAGH MERVYN MR | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
MORAG ELLIS MISS | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Jane Gowman | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
GILLIAN BOWEN | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Revd Canon Dr Neil Robert Evans | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Clement Hutton-Mills | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
SHEILA ANNE NICOLL | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.