Trustees WHIRLOW GRANGE LIMITED
Charity number: 701073
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Rev Richard Finn Blackburn | Chair | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Revd Canon Mark Edward Brown | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rosemary Dorothy Murphy | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ELEANOR MARY SUTTON | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
REV DR CHRISTOPHER JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Peter Martin Rainford | Trustee | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev JOY ELIZABETH ADAMS | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MR D F BOOKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.