Dogfen lywodraethu THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 28 DECEMBER 1951 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 20 DECEMBER 1965, 12 FEBRUARY 1981 AND 20 OCTOBER 1989, 22 JULY 1993. ORDER DATED 13TH JULY 2000, S16 & 21, TRANSFERRING LAND TO THE OFFICIAL CUSTODIAN SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/12/2014 as amended on 14 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF OLD AGE AMONG BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR MATERIAL HELP (INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES ENGAGED IN SIMILAR WORK IN HASTINGS).
Maes buddion
IN OR NEAR THE BOROUGH OF HASTINGS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.