Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSTITUTE FOR FISCAL STUDIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/05/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/05/1999 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/12/2013 as amended on 27 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE INSTITUTE ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY PROMOTION ON A NON-POLITICAL BASIS OF THE STUDY AND DISCUSSION OF, AND THE EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE CONCERNING, THE ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL EFFECTS AND INFLUENCES OF: 4.1.1 EXISTING TAXES; 4.1.2 PROPOSED CHANGES IN FISCAL SYSTEMS; AND 4.1.3 OTHER ASPECTS OF PUBLIC POLICY, IN EACH
Maes buddion
UNRESTRICTED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.