Dogfen lywodraethu SNOWDON TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/05/1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/12/1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/06/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO AWARD A BURSARY OR BURSARIES ANNUALLY TO ONE OR MORE NEEDY PHYSICALLY DISABLED STUDENT FOR THE PURPOSE OF ASSISTING THE BENEFICIARY TO PURSUE SOME ACADEMIC, SCIENTIFIC OR PRACTICAL ACHIEVEMENT WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BY BEYOND HIS/HER FINANCIAL MEANS ON ACCOUNT OF DISABILITY, SUCH BURSARY TO BE FOR PERIODS OF EITHER ONE OR TWO YEARS EACH (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST DEED).
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.