Dogfen lywodraethu THE STAFFORD I SASSOON MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1931 AND SCHEMES OF THE 29TH APRIL 1958 AND THE 7TH AUGUST 1969 AND 2ND JULY 2001. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(7) "THE OBJECT OF THE CLARITY IS TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO JEWISH WOMEN AND GIRLS LIVING IN THE UK WHO HAVE A CONNECTION WITH THE SEPHARDI COMMUNITY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE. "
Maes buddion
UK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.