Dogfen lywodraethu YORK CITY CHARITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT 5 JULY 1956,SCHEMES OF 16 JULY 1957,24 MAY 1960,17 DECEMBER 1962, 3 FEBRUARY 1972 AND 19 JULY 1972.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT BRANCH; FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF YORK AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT (SEE CLAUSE 31 OF SCHEME). 2. ALMSHOUSE AND PENSION BRANCH; THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES AND PENSIONS TO POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE CITY OF YORK FOR NOT LESS THAN FOUR YEARS. 3. POORS BRANCH; FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF YORK CITY GENERALLY OR OF SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
CITY OF YORK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.