Dogfen lywodraethu THE KATHERINE MARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON THE 8 SEPTEMBER 1959, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 JULY 1995, TRUSTEES' MEETING OF 14 MAY 1996, AND ORDER DATED 20 DECEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2016 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO DIVIDE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AMONGST THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS NAMELY: 1) BARNARDOS. 2) THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN. 3) THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY OF ANIMALS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.