Trosolwg o’r elusen GLOUCESTER AND DISTRICT SAMARITANS
Rhif yr elusen: 219432-25
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/02/1972
AS AMENDED ON 02/05/1991
AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2004
AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2006
AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2012
AS AMENDED ON 25/03/2013
AS AMENDED ON 23 FEB 2016
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN GLOUCESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
GLOUCESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA)
Hanes cofrestru
- 25 Awst 1972: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- SAMARITANS OF GLOUCESTER (Enw gwaith)
- THE SAMARITANS - GLOUCESTER (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.