Dogfen lywodraethu THE CITY AND GUILDS OF LONDON INSTITUTE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 26/10/1900 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 19/07/1910 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 16/03/2011 AND STATUTES REVISED 23/12/1980 AND STATUTES REVISED 28/10/1993 AND STATUTES REVISED 06/10/1994 AND STATUTES REVISED 16/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 28 JUN 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PURPOSES OF ALL SUCH BRANCHES OF SCIENCE AND THE FINE ARTS AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT, DISSEMINATION, PROPAGATION, PROMOTION, CULTURE AND APPLICATION OF ALL SUCH BRANCHES OF SCIENCE AND THE FINE ARTS AS BENEFIT OR ARE OF USE TO OR MAY BENEFIT OR BE OF USE TO PRODUCTIVE AND TECHNICAL INDUSTRIES ESPECIALLY AND TO COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY GENERALLY OR ANY BRANCH THEREOF.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.