Dogfen lywodraethu ST CATHERINE'S BRITISH SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/09/1965 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/01/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/05/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE FOR AND PROMOTE THE MORAL, CULTURAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL, PHYSICAL AND AESTHETIC DEVELOPMENT AND THE TEACHING AND INSTRUCTION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BROADLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM FOR ENGLAND AND WALES AND WITH A VIEW TO PREPARING BOYS AND GIRLS FOR SUITABLE QUALIFICATIONS PURSUED BY LEADING INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS WELL AS BRITISH INTERNATIONAL SCHOOLS IN SO FAR AS IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.