Dogfen lywodraethu CYSTIC FIBROSIS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 18TH JANUARY 2000 AND 8TH DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2017 as amended on 24 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF AND A CURE FOR CYSTIC FIBROSIS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2) THE CARE, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE CHARITABLE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CYSTIC FIBROSIS IN ANY FORM AND 3) THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.