Dogfen lywodraethu LOUGHBOROUGH SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 MAY 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY CARRYING ON IN GREAT BRITAIN A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS WHICH MAY BE DAY OR BOARDING AT WHICH INFANTS, CHILDREN AND STUDENTS MAY OBTAIN EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION IN ACADEMIC, SPORTING, MUSICAL, CULTURAL, SCIENTIFIC, TECHNICAL, RELIGIOUS, VOCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND COMMERCIAL SUBJECTS ACTIVITIES AND CRAFTS OF EVERY DESCRIPTION AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.