Dogfen lywodraethu HELEN & DOUGLAS HOUSE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 MARCH 2001, 10 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 10 APRIL 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2016 as amended on 01 Aug 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are the relief of sickness and stress and in particular 1 To provide palliative and supportive care to children and young people with life-shortening conditions in order to relieve sickness and stress and in particular to enable them to live as well and as fully as possible to the end of their lives, supporting their needs and wishes at the time of their death. 2 To promote the well-being of families and carers of children and young people with life-shortening conditions by providing counselling, practical support and bereavement care
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OXFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.