Trosolwg o’r elusen CHARITY OF MABEL CLARISSE WARBURTON
Rhif yr elusen: 221563-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
WILL PROVED 23 MARCH 1962 AND SCHEMES OF 14 DECEMBER 1964, 1 FEBRUARY 1977, 22 OCTOBER 1982 AND 12 AUGUST 2003.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES; AND
(1B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEE DECIDES.
(2) THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO PERSONS WHO WERE BORN IN OR RESIDE IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WALTHAM HOLY CROSS.
(3) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEE IS UNABLE TO FIND BENEFICIARIES AS MENTIONED IN CLAUSE 4(1) THE HOMES MAY BE OCCUPIED BY BENEFICIARIES FROM OUTSIDE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
(4) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 9 OF THIS SCHEME.
Maes buddion
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WALTHAM HOLY CROSS.
Hanes cofrestru
- 15 Mehefin 2005: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.