Trustees THE REACH FOR HEALTH CENTRE LTD
Charity number: 1138302
Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JUSON | Chair | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jarrod Baughan | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roshni Khatri | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Kilshaw | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Rollason | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Davies | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Salisbury | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Howe | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.