Dogfen lywodraethu For Us Too
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/2012 as amended on 07 Jan 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION EXPERIENCED BY FAMILIES WITH DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN EAST KENT [SWALE, CANTERBURY AND THANET] THROUGH: I. THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR PARENTS/CARERS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. II. THE PROVISION OF LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL SERVICES FOR DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES. III. THE PROVISION OF OTHER SERVICES AS IDENTIFIED BY DISABLED CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES. IV. THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AIMED AT INCREASING THE INCLUSION OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN MAINSTREAM SOCIETY. V. ENGAGING IN CAMPAIGNS, ADVISORY BODIES AND OTHER MEANS IN ORDER TO INFLUENCE PUBLIC POLICY AND LEGISLATION RELATING TO DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
EAST KENT [SWALE, CANTERBURY AND THANET]
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.