Trustees NORTHGATE (BRIDGNORTH) SWIMMING CLUB
Charity number: 1149690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Thomas | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hunt | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Morris | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Homer | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Oliver | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Owen | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Smith | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Marshall | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Pace | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Lewis | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Justin Shinton | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.