Dogfen lywodraethu THE PROUD TRUST LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/10/2015 as amended on 05 Oct 2019 as amended on 19 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENGLAND: (1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, GUIDANCE, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND SOCIAL MEETING SPACES. (2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY. (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.