Trustees SAMARITANS OF PRESTON AND DISTRICT
Charity number: 1173718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Helen Jackson | Chair | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Morgan | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Dunn | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bowerman | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Callagher | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wenham | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.