Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIMBERLEY AND NUTHALL
Charity number: 1184262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND BARBARA MARY HOLBROOK | Chair | 02 February 2015 |
|
|||||
John William George Cass | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Alan Chambers | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Louise Randle | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Mary Bradley | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Rosemary Byron | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hughes | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Stephanie Robinson | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew George Beeston | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Meryl Lorraine Lambton | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Churchman | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.