Dogfen lywodraethu Lake District Music Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 APRIL 2010. as amended on 27 Apr 2018 as amended on 28 Feb 2020 as amended on 30 Apr 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2023 as amended on 05 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC AND THE OTHER ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO ENCOURAGE BY MEANS OF SUMMER SCHOOLS AND FESTIVALS IN THE LAKE DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE THE STUDY PERFORMANCE KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING (BUT NO LIMITED TO) MUSIC OPERA BALLET MIME DRAMA CINEMA LITERATURE AND THE VISUAL ARTS AND TO FURMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.