Dogfen lywodraethu THE UNITED WORLD COLLEGE OF THE ATLANTIC LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 OCTOBER 1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11 JANUARY 1969,16 APRIL 1969,1 NOVEMBER 1974,20 MARCH 1980,26 FEB 1990, JUNE 2007 as amended on 01 Sep 2021 as amended on 01 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF YOUTH IN LEADERSHIP, LOYALTY, RESPONSIBILITY AND RESPECT FOR AND UNDER TAKING OF HUMAN DIGNITY, LIFE AND RIGHTS AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO OWN AND OPERATE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND FACILITIES. THE OBJECTIVE INCLUDES THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENVIRONMENTAL STEWARDSHIP, SERVICE TO OTHERS AND GLOBAL CITIZENSHIP.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.