Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOUTH WALES SEARCH AND RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 13/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2012 as amended on 19 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEVING OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS IN SOUTH AND MID WALES, BUT WITHOUT GEOGRAPHIC LIMITATION AND TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE SECURE AND EFFICIENT SEARCH AND RESCUE OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS SO ENDANGERED, AND TO ACT AS THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY ON BEHALF OF THE MEMBERS TEAMS FOR REPRESENTATIONS TO THE MOUNTAIN RESCUE ENGLAND AND WALES AND SUCH OTHER NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL OF GOVERNMENT BODIES AS MAY BE APPROPRIATE.
Maes buddion
SOUTH AND MID WALES BUT WITHOUT GEOGRAPHIC LIMITATION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.