Dogfen lywodraethu IDEASUK (THE UK ASSOCIATION OF SUGGESTION SCHEMES)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED 4 NOVEMBER 1993, 3 NOVEMBER 1994 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1995. FURTHER AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 1997, 11 NOVEMBER 1998, 2 NOVEMBER 1999 , 16 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2006. UPDATED 14 MAY 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EXPLAIN AND PROMOTE TO INDUSTRY, COMMERCE AND THE PUBLIC SECTOR GENERALLY IN THE UK, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE BENEFITS OF SUGGESTION AND EMPLOYEE INVOLVEMENT PROGRAMMES, IN FURTHERANCE WHEREOF THE ASSOCIATION MAY: 1) FACILITATE TRAINING AND EDUCATION TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THE ESTABLISHMENT AND GROWTH OF WELL-RUN SUGGESTION AND EMPLOYEE INVOLVEMENT PROGRAMMES. 2) PROVIDE FOR MEMBERS A FORUM REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY FOR THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 3) FACILITATE SERVICES IN SUPPORT OF THE MEMBERS EMPLOYEE INVOLVEMENT PROGRAMMES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.