Dogfen lywodraethu BON SECOURS HEALTH SYSTEM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 NOVEMBER 1992 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 JANUARY 1993, 10 NOVEMBER 1993, 26 JANUARY 1994 AND 18 MARCH 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY THE VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN CALLED THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF BON SECOURS OF PARIS AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE ADVANCEMENT (SUBJECT TO AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH) OF THE HEALTH CARE MISSION, OR APOSTOLATE, OF THE CONGREGATION IN GREAT BRITAIN
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.