Dogfen lywodraethu ADEPT COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 1018919
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 MARCH 1993 AND 18 JULY 1996 AND CERT OF INCORP OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9TH OCTOBER 1996 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH JULY 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ENGLAND AND WALES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM)
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
ENGLAND AND WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.