Dogfen lywodraethu CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 23RD OCTOBER 1995 AND 4TH NOVEMBER 1996 AND 12TH OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCTOBER 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC, ESPECIALLY THE MORE MODERN REPERTOIRE, BY PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS ONCE A TERM (ACCORDING TO THE UNIVERSITY CALENDAR) AND BY SUCH WAYS AS THE ORCHESTRA THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. (B) THE ORCHESTRA SHALL NOT DISCRIMINATE IN THE CHOICE OF MEMBERS, SOLOISTS OR CONDUCTORS ON GROUNDS OF GENDER, RACE OR RELIGION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.