Dogfen lywodraethu Friends of Stover Country Park

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1991 AND AMENDED 12 NOVEMBER 1992 as amended on 16 Jul 2019 as amended on 05 May 2021 as amended on 21 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST WITH THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF STOVER COUNTRY PARK BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT OR FACILITIES NOT USUALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE ENVIRONMENT ITS FLORA AND FAUNA PARTICULARLY WITHIN STOVER COUNTRY PARK
Maes buddion
STOVER COUNTRY PARK IN THE PARISH OF TEIGNGRACE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.