Dogfen lywodraethu ASHBEIAN MUSICAL THEATRE GROUP
Rhif yr elusen: 1037694

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 1994 AND 22 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2015 as amended on 21 Jun 2018 as amended on 07 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO EDUCATE AND ENTERTAIN THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS, AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF ITS MEMBERS’ AND THE PUBLIC’S APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.