Dogfen lywodraethu QUALITY IMPROVEMENT AGENCY
Rhif yr elusen: 1044145
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1994 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1995, 6 MAY 1998, 14 DECEMBER 2000, 13TH SEPTEMBER 2001, 18TH JULY 2003, 31 JANUARY 2008 & 12 JUNE 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.