Dogfen lywodraethu CHURCH OF GOD - UNITED KINGDOM
Rhif yr elusen: 1059248

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF 23 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11 NOVEMBER 1996, 6 DEC 1998, 03 JUNE 2007 AND 23 DECEMBER 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY PREACHING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND THE KINGDOM OF GOD AND TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.