Dogfen lywodraethu POWER INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE CAPACITY OF DISABLED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN POORER COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD TO ARTICULATE THEIR OWN NEEDS, SUPPORTING THEM IN TAKING AN ACTIVE PART IN MEETING THOSE NEEDS, AND IN ENGAGING FULLY IN SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE; 3.2 TO SUPPORT AND BUILD THE CAPACITY OF DISABLED PEOPLE'S ORGANISATIONS SO THAT THEY MAY TAKE AN ACTIVE PART IN CIVIL PROCESSES, SOURCE SERVICES FOR THEIR MEMBERS, AND LOBBY FOR FULL INCLUSION OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN SOCIETY; 3.3 TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND MENTORING IN PROFESSIONAL SKILLS NECESSARY FOR THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY PARTICULARLY IN THE AFTERMATH OF HUMAN CONFLICT; 3.4 TO SUPPORT DISABLED PEOPLE'S STRUGGLE FOR EQUAL RIGHTS; 3.5 TO UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE POOR, DISABLED, AGED OR SICK, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE TRUSTEES"), THINK FIT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.