Dogfen lywodraethu CORPORATE HEALTH LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/05/1948 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/08/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
***** IN ADMINISTRATION ***** (I) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH SERVICES TO EMPLOYERS. (II) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PREVENTION OF WORK RELATED DISEASES AND INJURY AND TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL HEALTH OF THOSE IN EMPLOYMENT. (III) TO PROVIDE, WHETHER IN THE WORKPLACE OR ELSEWHERE, ADVICE, EMERGENCY MEDICAL TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION FOR THOSE IN EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE SICK OR INJURED. (IV) TO PROVIDE REHABILITATION FACILITIES FOR THOSE IN EMPLOYMENT AND OTHERS DISABLED BY INJURY OR SICKNESS AND TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR LIVING IN EACH CASE REGARDLESS OF THE CAUSE OF THE DISABILITY. (V) TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AND OTHER TRAINING COURSES IN THE FIELD OF OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY, TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (VI) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT BY GRANTS OF MONEY AND/OR PAYMENT OF FEES AND/OR EXPENSES OR OTHERWISE ANY TEACHING RESEARCH OR INVESTIGATION RELATING TO THE OBJECTS THAT THE CHARITY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY THINK FIT. (VII) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO HEALTH RELATED CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS.
Maes buddion
SLOUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.